Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024