|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-61
|
|
|
|
04/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (703346)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|