Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024