Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Filed |