Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024