|
06/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-218
|
|
|
|
05/31/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted for CS/HB 1517
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (469420)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/07/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Transportation; Environment and Natural Resources; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|