Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024