Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1565
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/20/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|