Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024