Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1291
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1291
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|