Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024