Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Filed |