Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024