Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/20/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |