Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024