Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 433
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 433
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|