Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024