|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-21
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/19/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 86, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 981975 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 535587 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) failed (346340)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|