Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024