Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1365
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1365
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|