Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024