|
06/19/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-246, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7085 (Ch. 2024-225), CS/SB 7072 (Ch. 2024-247)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (413719)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 413719 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (105952)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|