Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024