Senate | 03/07/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7089 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Substituted HB 7089 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Retained on Special Order Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |