Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024