Senate | 02/28/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 1393 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Substituted HB 1393 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |