Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024