Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1555
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1555
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/20/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|