Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024