Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|