Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024