Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |