Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024