Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 7005
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Substituted HB 7005
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 12/13/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections
|
|
|