Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023

Prefiled

Bill December 4, 2023