|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-15
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1549
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (344336, 542768, 644826, 746956, 796312, 912678) 211
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/18/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/11/24, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/12/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Health Policy
|
|
|