Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill January 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 16, 2024

Prefiled

Bill December 4, 2023