|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-161
|
|
|
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (089309, 133095, 616755)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 133095 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 089309 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 616755 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Education Postsecondary
|
|
|