Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 11, 2024