Senate | 02/15/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Substituted HB 7001 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/24 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |