Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 12, 2024