|
07/01/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-275
|
|
|
|
06/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (841004)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|