Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 18, 2024