Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1203
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1203
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Regulated Industries
|
|
|