Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 24, 2024