Senate | 03/06/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7085 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Substituted HB 7085 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |