LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7070
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7070
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7070
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2024
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
February 27, 2024
Analysis
February 26, 2024
Analysis
February 20, 2024
Analysis
February 19, 2024
Prefiled
Bill
February 15, 2024
Compare