|
06/19/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-247, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7078 (Ch. 2024-248), CS/CS/CS/SB 1582 (Ch. 2024-246)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (517038)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|