LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7072
Compare Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7072
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7072
Compare Versions
S7072 Enrolled March 6, 2024
S7072 Engrossed February 29, 2024
S7072 Comm Sub February 26, 2024
S7072 Introduced February 21, 2024
S7072 Prefiled February 15, 2024
Version 1 (Old)
S7072 Enrolled March 6, 2024
S7072 Engrossed February 29, 2024
S7072 Comm Sub February 26, 2024
S7072 Introduced February 21, 2024
S7072 Prefiled February 15, 2024
Version 2 (New)
Compare