Senate | 03/07/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 7073 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/24 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | CS by Appropriations read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Finance and Tax |